Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/22/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/22/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/22/1995
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 02/22/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 02/22/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/27/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/10/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/07/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/25/1995
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/04/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/08/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/16/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/19/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/19/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/13/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/17/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/17/1995