Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/02/1995
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 03/02/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/05/1995
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/26/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/12/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/10/1995
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/23/1996