Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/15/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/15/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/28/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/28/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/03/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/05/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/24/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/24/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/26/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/26/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 04/26/1995