Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/03/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/03/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/07/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/20/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/20/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/27/1995
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 08/07/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/12/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/26/1995
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/26/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/23/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/23/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/23/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/31/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/31/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/29/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/13/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/29/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/29/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/29/1996
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/13/1996