Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/23/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 04/25/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/03/1995
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/05/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/10/1995
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/23/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/28/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/28/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/28/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/10/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/19/1995
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/19/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 08/11/1995
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/12/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 10/23/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/01/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/02/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/02/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 12/08/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 12/20/1995
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/22/1996
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 01/22/1996
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/28/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/19/1996
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 03/19/1996
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/16/1996
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/16/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/06/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/28/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/11/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/11/1996
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/02/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/11/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/18/1996
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/24/1996