Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/04/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/04/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/04/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/12/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/12/1995
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 08/03/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/30/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/06/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/09/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/09/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/27/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/23/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/17/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/21/1996
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/22/1996