Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/09/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/09/1995
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/10/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/10/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/10/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/10/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/10/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/10/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/10/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/10/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/10/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/10/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/10/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/11/1995
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/11/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/16/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/16/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/17/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/17/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/17/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/18/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/18/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/18/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/18/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/18/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/22/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 05/23/1995
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 05/23/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/24/1995
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/25/1995
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/05/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/05/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/06/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/08/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/08/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/08/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/08/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/09/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/13/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/14/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/14/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/15/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/18/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/19/1995
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/19/1995
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/24/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/25/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/26/1995
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/02/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/14/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/20/1995