Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/11/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/11/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/11/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/16/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/16/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/24/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/08/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/31/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/13/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/27/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/27/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 05/06/1996
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/10/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/18/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/18/1996
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/19/1996
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 06/25/1996
Sen. Frahm, Sheila [R-KS] 07/16/1996