There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Water Desalination Act of 1996

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Water Desalination Act of 1996

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Water Desalination Research and Development Act of 1996

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Water Desalinization Research and Development Act of 1996

Short Titles as Introduced

Water Desalinization Research and Development Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to conduct studies regarding the desalination of water and water reuse, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize research into the desalinization and reclamation of water and authorize a program for States, cities, or qualifying agencies desiring to own and operate a water desalinization or reclamation facility to develop such facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (11)

Date Actions Overview
10/11/1996Became Public Law No: 104-298. (TXT | PDF)
10/11/1996Signed by President.
10/02/1996Presented to President.
09/27/1996Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11582-11583)
09/24/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/16/1996Committee on Transportation discharged.
09/16/1996Committee on Science discharged.
09/16/1996Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-790, Part I.
05/03/1996Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4686-4688)
04/18/1996Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 104-254.
05/17/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (38)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/11/1996Became Public Law No: 104-298. (TXT | PDF)
10/11/1996Signed by President.
10/02/1996SenatePresented to President.
09/28/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/1996SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11582-11583)
09/24/1996SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
09/24/1996-1:58pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/24/1996-1:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/1996-1:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/24/1996-1:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/24/1996-1:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10802-10804)
09/24/1996-1:51pmHouseMr. Doolittle moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/16/1996HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 428.
09/16/1996HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
09/16/1996HouseCommittee on Science discharged.
09/16/1996HouseHouse Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 16, 1996.
09/16/1996HouseHouse Committee on Science Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 16, 1996.
09/16/1996HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-790, Part I.
08/01/1996HouseSubcommittee on Water and Power Resources Discharged.
08/01/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Resources
08/01/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/28/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/20/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science
05/20/1996HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Army, Interior.
05/20/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/14/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/14/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/14/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/14/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/06/1996-2:50pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/06/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/06/1996-2:00pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/03/1996SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4686-4688)
04/18/1996SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 375.
04/18/1996SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 104-254.
03/28/1996SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/17/1995SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
05/17/1995SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6803-6804)

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works05/17/1995 Referred to
03/28/1996 Markup by
04/18/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-254
House Resources05/14/1996 Referred to
08/01/1996 Markup by
09/16/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-790
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources05/20/1996 Referred to
08/01/1996 Discharged from
House Science05/14/1996 Referred to
09/16/1996 Discharged from
House Science Subcommittee on Energy and Environment05/20/1996 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/14/1996 Referred to
09/16/1996 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment05/28/1996 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.811.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.811. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/24/1996)

Water Desalination Act of 1996 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to award grants and contracts to conduct, encourage, and assist in the financing of research to develop processes for converting saline water into water suitable for beneficial uses. Provides appropriate research and study topics.

Requires the Secretary to recommend to the Congress desalination demonstration projects or full-scale desalination projects to carry out the purposes of this Act and to further evaluate and implement the results of the research and studies conducted.

(Sec. 4) Directs the Secretary to administer and conduct a demonstration and development program for water desalination and related activities, including desalination plants and modules, byproducts marketing, economic cost surveys, and desalination cooperative agreements.

(Sec. 5) Requires all information from studies sponsored or funded under this Act to be considered public information.

(Sec. 6) Authorizes the Secretary to accept technical and administrative assistance in carrying out this Act.

(Sec. 7) Provides Federal cost-sharing limitations for demonstration or development projects conducted under this Act.

(Sec. 8) Authorizes appropriations for FY 1997 through 2002.

(Sec. 9) Requires the Secretary to consult with the heads of Federal agencies which have experience in conducting desalination research or operating desalination facilities.