Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/05/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/08/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/13/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/15/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/26/1995
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/29/1995