There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Local Empowerment and Flexibility Act of 1996

Short Titles as Introduced

Local Empowerment and Flexibility Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the overall economy and efficiency of Government operations and enable more efficient use of Federal funding, by enabling local governments and private, nonprofit organizations to use amounts available under certain Federal assistance programs in accordance with approved local flexibility plans.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/1996Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Stevens with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 104-331. Additional and minority views filed.
01/04/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
07/23/1996Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 511.
Action By: Senate
07/23/1996Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Stevens with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 104-331. Additional and minority views filed.
05/16/1996Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
12/05/1995Committee on Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 104-586.
01/04/1995Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate
01/04/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S309-311, S314-315)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/09/1995

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs01/04/1995 Referred to
12/05/1995 Hearings by
05/16/1996 Markup by
07/23/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-331

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.88. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/23/1996)

Local Empowerment and Flexibility Act of 1996 - Lists the purposes of this Act, including enabling State, local, and tribal governments and private, nonprofit organizations to more efficiently use and adapt Federal financial assistance programs to meet the particular needs of their communities. Creates a Community Empowerment Board composed of specified Cabinet Secretaries and agency heads. Requires that the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), in consultation with the Board, coordinate and assist in creating: (1) a uniform Federal financial assistance application; (2) a release form to facilitate the sharing of information across Federal financial assistance programs; and (3) a system wherein an organization or consortium of organizations may use one proposal to apply for assistance.

Authorizes an applicant to apply to the Board for approval of a flexibility plan which must meet specified requirements, including that the application be submitted to, and contain all comments on the proposed plan made by, each affected State and local government.Provides for the submission of an application to the Board without such comments if, within 60 days of submission of the plan to an affected government, such government has failed to act on or endorse the application.

Directs that the Board review at least the first 50 flexibility plans received each year. Specifies that the Board give priority consideration to flexibility plans that: (1) are submitted from empowerment zone areas; and (2) contain State or local waivers or a commitment to grant a State or local waiver. Authorizes the Board to develop additional criteria in determining which additional flexibility plans it reviews after the first 50 each year.

Requires such a plan to improve the effectiveness and efficiency of providing benefits under Federal financial assistance programs included in the plan such as reducing administrative inflexibility, duplication, and unnecessary expenditures.

Authorizes affected Federal agencies to waive any requirement under a Federal financial assistance program if the waiver is: (1) reasonably necessary to implement a plan; and (2) not disapproved by the Board.

Requires an approved applicant to periodically evaluate the effectiveness of its plan and report on it to the Board. Mandates a final report to the Board.

Authorizes the Board to provide, or direct a Federal agency head to provide, technical assistance to an eligible applicant in developing information necessary for the design or implementation of a flexibility plan.

Requires the: (1) Board to report to the President and the Congress on the Federal laws or regulations most frequently waived, with the President determining whether such requirements should be amended or terminated; (2) OMB Director to report on its progress in fulfilling its responsibilities under this Act; and (3) Board, in consultation with the Director and Federal agencies, to submit a final report to the President and the Congress.

Repeals this Act on September 30, 2001.

Requires all Federal agencies to develop a consistent policy that stipulates that the date of the U.S. postmark shall be deemed to be the date of delivery for any Federal contract, grant, assistance application, or other document which is required to be filed by a certain date and is delivered late by U.S. mail.