Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 06/06/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/06/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 06/06/1995
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/06/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/06/1995
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/06/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 06/06/1995
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 06/06/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/11/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/11/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/11/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/11/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/11/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/27/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/27/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/07/1995
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/07/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/07/1995
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/07/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 08/07/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 08/10/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 08/10/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 08/10/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 08/10/1995
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 08/10/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 08/10/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 08/10/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 08/10/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 08/10/1995
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 08/10/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 08/10/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/10/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 08/10/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 08/10/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 08/10/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 08/10/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 08/10/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/10/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/10/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 08/10/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 08/10/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 08/11/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/08/1995