Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/10/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 01/11/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/11/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 01/11/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 01/13/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 01/13/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/13/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/18/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 01/18/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/03/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/07/1995