Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/13/1995
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/21/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/26/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/26/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 06/26/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/26/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/26/1995
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/10/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/12/1995