Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 06/20/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/20/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 06/20/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 06/20/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/20/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 06/20/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/10/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 08/07/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 08/07/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 09/05/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/08/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/08/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/19/1995
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/26/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/27/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/27/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/27/1995
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/27/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/29/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/29/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/11/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/11/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/11/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/11/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/18/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/18/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/18/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/27/1995
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/27/1995
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 10/27/1995
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/02/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 11/02/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/07/1995
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 11/15/1995
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/15/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/15/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 11/17/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/17/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/17/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/17/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 12/15/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/06/1996
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/01/1996
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/07/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/18/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/19/1996
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/25/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/08/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/24/1996