Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 06/21/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 06/21/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 06/21/1995
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 06/21/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/21/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/11/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/11/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/27/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/20/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/20/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/20/1995
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/20/1995
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/06/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/14/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/01/1996
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 02/01/1996
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/01/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/01/1996
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/01/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/01/1996
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/01/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 02/20/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/20/1996
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/20/1996
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/20/1996
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/20/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/20/1996
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/20/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/05/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/05/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/05/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/05/1996
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/05/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/05/1996
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/05/1996
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/05/1996
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/13/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/13/1996
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/13/1996
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/13/1996
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/20/1996
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/20/1996
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/20/1996
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/20/1996
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/20/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 03/20/1996
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/27/1996
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/27/1996
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/27/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/29/1996
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 04/18/1996
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/18/1996
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/18/1996
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/18/1996
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/22/1996
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/03/1996
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/03/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/03/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/03/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/14/1996
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/03/1996
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/12/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/17/1996