Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/17/1995
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/17/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/17/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/20/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/20/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/03/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/10/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/10/1995
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/26/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 12/05/1995
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 01/26/1996
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/25/1996
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/17/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/18/1996
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/30/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/20/1996