Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 06/27/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/27/1995
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/10/1995
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/11/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/20/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/21/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/21/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 08/01/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/11/1995
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/13/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/13/1995
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/13/1995
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/25/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/29/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/29/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/11/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/11/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/19/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 11/27/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/30/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/06/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/14/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 12/14/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 12/19/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/02/1996
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/23/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 01/23/1996
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/11/1996
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/11/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/11/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/11/1996
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/27/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/29/1996
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/29/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 03/29/1996
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/15/1996
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/17/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/20/1996
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/11/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/08/1996
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/23/1996
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/23/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/23/1996
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/03/1996
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/03/1996
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/03/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/03/1996
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/03/1996
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/03/1996
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/03/1996
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/03/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew