Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/28/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 08/08/1995
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/12/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/13/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 09/25/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/29/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/11/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/26/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/26/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/26/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/14/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/14/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/14/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 11/14/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/16/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/16/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/16/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/16/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/16/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/16/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/16/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/17/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/17/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/17/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/17/1995
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 11/28/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 11/28/1995
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/28/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/28/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/28/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 11/28/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/28/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 11/28/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 11/28/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/29/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 11/29/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/29/1995
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/29/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/29/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/29/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/29/1995
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 11/29/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 11/29/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/29/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/29/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 12/05/1995
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 12/05/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 01/22/1996
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 01/22/1996