Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 06/29/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 06/29/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/29/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/06/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 10/19/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 12/05/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 12/20/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/20/1996
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/27/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/12/1996
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/15/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/18/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 05/14/1996
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/16/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/10/1996