Summary: S.991 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (12/12/1995)

Extends through December 31, 1996, the authority of the Department of Veterans Affairs to furnish priority medical care and services to veterans: (1) exposed to a toxic substance, radiation, or environmental hazard during a period of active duty; or (2) exposed to a toxic substance or environmental hazard while performing active duty in Southwest Asia during the Persian Gulf War. Ratifies any hospital or nursing home care or medical services furnished by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to persons under (1), above, during the period beginning on June 30, 1995, and ending on the date of enactment of this Act.

Extends through: (1) December 31, 1996, the authority of the Secretary to furnish outpatient services to Persian Gulf War veterans who may have been exposed during such service to a toxic substance or environmental hazard; (2) December 31, 1997, the authority to furnish care and treatment and rehabilitative services for veterans with alcohol or drug abuse dependence or disabilities; (3) December 31, 1996, the pilot program for noninstitutional alternatives to veterans' nursing home care; (4) FY 1997 a pilot project for guaranteeing adjustable rate mortgage loans to veteran in a manner similar to that provided by the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development under the National Housing Act; (5) December 31, 1997, the authorized period for entering into agreements to furnish housing assistance to homeless veterans; (6) December 31, 1999, the authority of the director of a Department health-care facility to use local-area compensation data when determining the rate of pay for certified registered nurse anesthetists (making such provision effective as of March 31, 1995, and ratifying the use of such data between such effective date and the effective date of this Act); (7) December 31, 1996, the Department's Health Professional Scholarship program; (8) December 31, 1997, the authority of the Secretary to enter into enhanced-use leases of real property under the Secretary's jurisdiction; (9) December 31, 1997, the authority for the provision of community-based residential care for homeless chronically mentally ill veterans and other veterans; (10) December 31, 1997, the authority for a demonstration program of veterans' compensated work therapy; and (11) FY 1997 the authority under the Homeless Veterans Comprehensive Service Programs Act of 1992 to make grants to assist homeless veterans.

Amends the Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act to extend through FY 1996 the authorized period and the authorization of appropriations for homeless veterans' reintegration projects under such Act.