Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/17/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 01/17/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 01/17/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 01/17/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 01/19/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/03/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/03/1995
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/08/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/08/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/23/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/27/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/05/1996