There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Flag Desecration bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to grant Congress and the States the power to prohibit the physical desecration of the flag of the United States.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/1995Failed of passage/not agreed to in Senate: Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 63-36. Record Vote No: 600.(consideration: CR S18394-18395)
09/27/1995Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. With written report No. 104-148. Additional and minority and supplemental views filed.
03/21/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (30)

Date All Actions
12/12/1995Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 63-36. Record Vote No: 600. (consideration: CR S18394-18395)
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3097 Amendment SP 3097 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 28-71. Record Vote No: 599.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3096 Proposed amendment SP 3096 withdrawn in Senate.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995Ruling of the Chair sustained by Yea-Nay Vote. 90-9. Record Vote No: 598.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3095 Ruling of the Chair sustained by Yea-Nay Vote. 90-9. Record Vote No: 598.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3095 SP 3095 ruled out of order by the chair.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3095 Point of order raised in Senate with respect to SP 3095.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3093 Amendment SP 3093 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 5-93. Record Vote No: 597.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S18373-18394)
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3095 Considered by Senate.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3093 Considered by Senate.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3097 Considered by Senate.
Action By: Senate
12/12/1995S.Amdt.3096 Considered by Senate.
Action By: Senate
12/11/1995S.Amdt.3097 Proposed by Senator McConnell. To provide for a substitute.
Action By: Senate
12/11/1995S.Amdt.3096 Proposed by Senator Hollings. To propose a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution.
Action By: Senate
12/11/1995S.Amdt.3095 Proposed by Senator Hollings. To propose a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution.
Action By: Senate
12/11/1995S.Amdt.3094 Amendment SP 3094 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
Action By: Senate
12/11/1995S.Amdt.3094 Proposed by Senator Hatch. To strike the authorization with respect to the States.
Action By: Senate
12/11/1995S.Amdt.3093 Proposed by Senator Biden. Proposing an amendment to the Constitution authorizing Congress to protect the physical integrity of the flag of the United States.
Action By: Senate
12/11/1995Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S18315-18333, S18336-18360)
Action By: Senate
12/08/1995Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S18253-18262, S18264-18268, S18272-18286)
Action By: Senate
12/07/1995Cloture motion on the motion to proceed withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (consideration: CR S18228)
Action By: Senate
12/06/1995Cloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S18086)
Action By: Senate
12/06/1995Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S18038-18049, S18056-18057, S18059-18063)
Action By: Senate
09/27/1995Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 195.
Action By: Senate
09/27/1995Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. With written report No. 104-148. Additional and minority and supplemental views filed.
07/20/1995Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/06/1995Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, Property. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, and Property Rights
03/21/1995Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate
03/21/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4275-4276)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/21/1995
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/03/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/03/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/03/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/05/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/25/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/02/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/19/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/05/1995
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/27/1995

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary03/21/1995 Referred to
07/20/1995 Markup by
09/27/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-148
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, and Property Rights06/06/1995 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.31. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/21/1995)

Constitutional Amendment - Declares that the Congress and the States shall have power to prohibit the physical desecration of the U.S. flag.