Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/21/1995
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/21/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/03/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/03/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/03/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/05/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/25/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/02/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/19/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/05/1995
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/27/1995