Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/18/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/18/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/18/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/18/1995
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 05/18/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 05/18/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 05/18/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/23/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/24/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/05/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/09/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/20/1995
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/11/1995