Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/22/1996
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/22/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/22/1996
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/05/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/25/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/25/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/25/1996
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/25/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/25/1996
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/25/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/25/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/25/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/25/1996
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/25/1996
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/25/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/25/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/25/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/25/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 06/25/1996
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/25/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/25/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/27/1996
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/27/1996
Sen. Frahm, Sheila [R-KS] 07/16/1996
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/29/1996
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/29/1996
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/30/1996
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/16/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew