There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to commend Operation Sail for its advancement of brotherhood among nations, its continuing commemoration of the history of the United States, and its nurturing of young cadets through training in seamanship.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/09/1996Became Public Law No: 104-282. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1996Signed by President.
09/30/1996Presented to President.
09/27/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/24/1996Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11201)
09/24/1996Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
10/09/1996Became Public Law No: 104-282. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1996Signed by President.
09/30/1996SenatePresented to President.
09/27/1996-6:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/1996-6:07pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
09/27/1996-6:05pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H11546-11547)
09/27/1996-6:05pmHouseMr. Gilman asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
09/25/1996-6:23pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/25/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/25/1996-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
09/24/1996SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11201)

Committees (0)

As of 08/18/2019 text has not been received for S.J.Res.64 - A joint resolution to commend Operation Sail for its advancement of brotherhood among nations, its continuing commemoration of the history of the United States, and its nurturing of young cadets through training in seamanship.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.64. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/24/1996)

Commends Operation Sail and encourages its continuation into the next millennium. Encourages all individuals to join in the celebration of the 224th birthday of the United States of America and the international camaraderie that Operation Sail and the International Naval Review will foster.