Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/12/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/13/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/13/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/14/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/14/1995
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/14/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/18/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/19/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/19/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/20/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/21/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/25/1995
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/28/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 08/03/1995
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/03/1995
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/04/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 08/07/1995
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 08/10/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/11/1995
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/18/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/21/1995
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/25/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/25/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/25/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/25/1995
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/29/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/10/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/10/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/10/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/12/1995
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/12/1995
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/19/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/25/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/01/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 11/01/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/01/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/03/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 11/03/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/03/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 11/03/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/09/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/09/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/09/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/09/1995
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/09/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/09/1995
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/09/1995
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/09/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/14/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/14/1995