Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/14/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/18/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/24/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/26/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/31/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/31/1995
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 08/01/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/01/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 08/02/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 08/02/1995
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 08/02/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 08/04/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 08/04/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 08/04/1995
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/04/1995
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/04/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/04/1995
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 08/08/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 08/09/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 08/09/1995
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 08/10/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/07/1995