Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 07/17/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 07/17/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/17/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/17/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 07/17/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 07/17/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/07/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 08/09/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 01/26/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 01/26/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 01/31/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/29/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/05/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/05/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/14/1996
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/27/1996
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/15/1996