Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/26/1996
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/09/1996
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/09/1996
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/09/1996
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/09/1996
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/20/1996
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/20/1996
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/20/1996
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 02/20/1996
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 02/20/1996
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/20/1996
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/20/1996
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/20/1996
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/20/1996
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/20/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/20/1996
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/23/1996
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/23/1996
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/27/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/28/1996
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/29/1996
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/07/1996
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/15/1996
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/28/1996
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 05/15/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew