Summary: S.Res.73 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.Res.73. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/25/1995)

Omnibus Committee Funding Resolution for 1995 and 1996 - Authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees from March 1, 1995, through September 30, 1996, and for the period March 1, 1996, through February 28, 1997: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Appropriations; (3) Armed Services; (4) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (5) Budget; (6) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (7) Energy and Natural Resources; (8) Environment and Public Works; (9) Finance; (10) Foreign Relations; (11) Governmental Affairs; (12) Judiciary; (13) Labor and Human Resources; (14) Rules and Administration; (15) Small Business; (16) Veterans' Affairs; (17) Aging; (18) Intelligence; and (19) Indian Affairs.

Authorizes the transfer of any unexpended balance of any committee for the period ending February 28, 1995, to a special reserve to be available to any committee to meet specified unpaid obligations or expenses.

Expresses the sense of the Senate that space assigned to committees covered by this resolution shall be reduced commensurate with the reductions in authorized staff funded herein. States that the Committee on Rules and Administration is expected to recover such space for purposes of equalizing Senators' offices and to consolidate the space for committees to reduce the cost of support equipment and office furniture and accessories.