Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/10/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/10/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/10/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/10/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/10/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/10/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/10/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/10/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/10/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/10/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/10/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/10/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/10/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/10/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/10/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/10/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/10/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/10/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/10/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/10/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/10/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/10/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/10/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/10/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/10/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/11/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/11/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/11/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/11/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/13/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 02/26/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/26/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/26/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/26/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/05/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/05/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/06/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/06/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/06/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/12/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/12/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/12/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/12/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/12/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew