There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mandates Information Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve congressional deliberation on proposed Federal private sector mandates, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/11/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/13/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E480)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/1997Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/20/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/20/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/16/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/16/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/23/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/23/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/08/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/16/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/16/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/16/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/04/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/24/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/24/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/24/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/24/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/24/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/26/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/11/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/17/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/25/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/30/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/30/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/31/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/08/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/11/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/11/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/23/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/24/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/30/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/30/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/30/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/13/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules03/11/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1010.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1010. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/1997)

Mandates Information Act of 1997 - Amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 (the Act) to require a congressional committee report on any bill or joint resolution that includes any Federal mandate to contain information concerning the impact of such mandate on consumers, workers, and small businesses, including any disproportionate impact in particular regions or industries.

Revises provisions concerning legislation subject to a point of order to: (1) define the point of order for a determination by the Director of the Congressional Budget Office (CBO Director) that it is not feasible to determine the economic impact of a Federal mandate; and (2) replace certain references to Federal intergovernmental mandates with references to Federal mandates.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that any unfunded mandates that are determined by the CBO Director to exceed the applicable threshold under the Act should be financed through reduced taxes, tax abatements, or direct compensation by the Federal Government.