Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/11/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/20/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/20/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/16/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/16/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/23/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/23/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/08/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/16/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/16/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/16/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/04/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/24/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/24/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/24/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/24/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/24/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/26/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/11/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/17/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/17/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/25/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/30/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/30/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/31/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/08/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/11/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/11/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/23/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/24/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/30/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/30/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/30/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/13/1997