There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Private Security Officer Quality Assurance Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

Private Security Officer Quality Assurance Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expedite State reviews of criminal records of applicants for private security officer employment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/28/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
06/26/1997Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 105-161, Part I.
01/07/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
09/11/1997SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
07/29/1997SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/28/1997-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/1997-4:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/28/1997-4:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/28/1997-4:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5857-5860)
07/28/1997-4:14pmHouseMr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/26/1997HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 105-161, Part I.
06/18/1997HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/18/1997HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/12/1997HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
06/12/1997HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
01/31/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/28/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/07/1997HouseReferred to House Judiciary
01/07/1997HouseReferred to House Education and the Workforce
01/07/1997HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/07/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/21/1997

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce01/07/1997 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations01/31/1997 Referred to
House Judiciary01/07/1997 Referred to
06/18/1997 Markup by
06/26/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-161
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime01/28/1997 Referred to
06/12/1997 Markup by
06/12/1997 Reported by
Senate Judiciary09/11/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.103. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/1997)

Private Security Officer Quality Assurance Act of 1997 - Authorizes an association of employers of private security officers (officers) to submit fingerprints or other methods of positive identification to the Attorney General for background checks of such officers. Allows the Attorney General to: (1) exchange identification and criminal history records with State governmental agencies for licensing and employment purposes; and (2) prescribe regulations to carry out this Act, including measures relating to the imposition of fees necessary for the recovery of costs.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that States should participate in the background check system established under this Act.