Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/12/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/15/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/15/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/15/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/15/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/15/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/15/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/15/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/15/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/15/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/15/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/01/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/01/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/01/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/06/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/04/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/16/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/11/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/25/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/30/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/11/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew