Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/05/1998