Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/12/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/12/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/12/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/12/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/06/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/06/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/06/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/22/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/15/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/15/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/15/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/15/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/15/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/25/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/25/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/25/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/25/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/08/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/24/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/24/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/24/1998