Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/10/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/10/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/10/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/10/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/10/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/16/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/16/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/23/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 05/15/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/20/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/24/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/03/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew