Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/20/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/09/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/15/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/15/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/15/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/15/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/15/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/24/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/24/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/06/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/06/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/08/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/14/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/14/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/14/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/14/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/14/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/20/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/20/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/04/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/10/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/10/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/17/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/17/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/17/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/09/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/09/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/10/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/16/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/16/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/23/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/23/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/23/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/03/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/24/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/24/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/24/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/24/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/24/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/24/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/24/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/24/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/09/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/09/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/09/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/09/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/09/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/21/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/21/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/21/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/06/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/06/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/08/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/08/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/08/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/02/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/02/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/19/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/19/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/19/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/28/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 04/30/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/30/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/19/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/19/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew