Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/13/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/20/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/08/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/08/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/15/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/15/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/24/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/24/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/24/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/06/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/06/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/06/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/06/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/06/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/14/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/14/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/21/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/21/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/21/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/23/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/23/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/23/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/23/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/23/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/23/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/23/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/26/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/26/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/08/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/08/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/11/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/11/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/11/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/28/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/28/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/28/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 07/28/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/28/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/28/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/28/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/28/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/28/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/30/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/03/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/03/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/05/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/10/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/10/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/16/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/16/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/16/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/13/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew