Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/13/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/28/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/07/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/07/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/21/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/25/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/08/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/08/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/30/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/30/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/30/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/30/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/07/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/25/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/25/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/12/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/12/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/12/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/09/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/22/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/22/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/23/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/23/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/05/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/09/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/09/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/18/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/07/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/14/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/20/1998