Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/28/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/28/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/28/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/13/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/21/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/21/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/21/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/21/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/21/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/21/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/03/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/03/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/10/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/10/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/10/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/10/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/28/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/01/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/26/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/24/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/24/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/25/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/25/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/16/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/16/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/30/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/30/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/30/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/30/1998