Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/13/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/10/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/10/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/15/1997