Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/13/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/09/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/09/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/01/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/08/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/16/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/16/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/18/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/18/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/15/1997