Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/18/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/19/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/19/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/19/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/19/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/20/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/20/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/20/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/08/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/14/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/14/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/14/1997