Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/15/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/23/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/23/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/21/1998