Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/21/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/15/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/15/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/15/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/15/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/01/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/01/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/10/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/10/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/11/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/17/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/17/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/17/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/17/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/17/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/17/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/18/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/19/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/19/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/23/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/23/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/08/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/08/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/08/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/10/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/11/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/22/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/29/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/31/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/04/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/04/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/10/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/16/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/16/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/16/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/16/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/17/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/18/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/18/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/18/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/23/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/25/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/25/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/26/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/26/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/29/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/29/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/30/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/30/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/01/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/06/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 10/06/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 10/06/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/06/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/06/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/07/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/08/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/08/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/21/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/23/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/23/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/31/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/31/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/05/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/05/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 11/07/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/05/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/05/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/24/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/10/1998