Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/18/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/18/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/18/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/18/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/18/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/18/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/09/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/24/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/24/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/06/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/06/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/06/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/06/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/16/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 05/16/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/08/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/08/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/07/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/07/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/28/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/28/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 01/28/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/28/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/28/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/28/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 01/28/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/28/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 01/28/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/28/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/05/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/05/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/05/1998